NJ A5002 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved P.L.2019, c.68.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved P.L.2019, c.68.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permits certain planned real estate developments to file certain liens; concerns limited priority of certain liens.*
Title
Permits certain planned real estate developments to file certain liens; concerns limited priority of certain liens.*
Sponsors
Rep. Annette Chaparro [D] | Rep. Ralph Caputo [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] |
Sen. Steven Oroho [R] | Sen. Dawn Addiego [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3414 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.68. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Substituted for S3414 (2R) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-1-1) |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3414 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by A5002 (1R)