NJ A4999 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved P.L.2019, c.66.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved P.L.2019, c.66.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires filing of certain creditor contact information with residential mortgage foreclosure complaint and lis pendens.
Title
Requires filing of certain creditor contact information with residential mortgage foreclosure complaint and lis pendens.
Sponsors
Rep. William Spearman [D] | Rep. Shanique Speight [D] | Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Sen. Steven Oroho [R] |
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Dawn Addiego [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3415 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.66. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Substituted for S3415 (2R) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-1-0) |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3415 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by A4999 (1R)