NJ A4999 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Approved P.L.2017, c.115.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Approved P.L.2017, c.115.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Designates portion of Route 44 in Borough of Paulsboro as "John D. Burzichelli Bridge."
Title
Designates portion of Route 44 in Borough of Paulsboro as "John D. Burzichelli Bridge."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S3336 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-13 | Senate | Approved P.L.2017, c.115. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Substituted for S3336 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3336 (Same As) 2017-06-26 - Substituted by A4999