NJ A4998 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-8)
Status: Introduced on June 12 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Substituted by S3241 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds to DEP for environmental infrastructure projects for FY2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates funds to DEP for environmental infrastructure projects for FY2018.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29AssemblySubstituted by S3241 (1R)
2017-06-19AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2017-06-15AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
2017-06-12AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3241 (Same As) 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.143.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback