NJ A4997 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved P.L.2019, c.65.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

"Mortgage Servicers Licensing Act."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Mortgage Servicers Licensing Act."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3417 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.65.
2019-03-25SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0)
2019-03-25SenateSubstituted for S3417 (1R)
2019-03-25SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2019-03-25AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (78-1-1)
2019-03-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-03-07AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2019-03-07AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
2019-02-14AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
2019-02-07AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3417 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by A4997 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback