NJ A4993 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S3406 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S3406 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Codifies current practice regarding completion of Perinatal Risk Assessment form by certain Medicaid health care providers.*
Title
Codifies current practice regarding completion of Perinatal Risk Assessment form by certain Medicaid health care providers.*
Sponsors
Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Rep. Eliana Marin [D] | Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] |
Rep. John Armato [D] | Rep. Cleopatra Tucker [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Substituted by S3406 (2R) |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3406 (Same As) 2019-05-08 - Approved P.L.2019, c.88.