NJ A4970 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on January 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-20 - Approved P.L.2019, c.371.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Revises law governing forfeiture of certain seized property.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises law governing forfeiture of certain seized property.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3441 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-20AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, c.371.
2020-01-13AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-2-0)
2020-01-13AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2020-01-13SenatePassed by the Senate (37-2)
2020-01-13SenateSubstituted for S3441 (2R)
2020-01-09SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-12-09SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2019-12-09SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-05-24SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
2019-05-23AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (70-2-4)
2019-05-20AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-02-07AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2019-01-28AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3441 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A4970 (3R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback