NJ A4963 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1744
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-28 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-28 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires private detectives to register their foreign employers with State Police.
Title
Requires private detectives to register their foreign employers with State Police.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2023-02-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2023-02-23 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2023-01-12 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2022-12-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4963 (Carry Over) 2023-02-28 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee