NJ A4958 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1899
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Vetoed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides temporary exemption under sales and use tax for winterizing certain small business operations.
Title
Provides temporary exemption under sales and use tax for winterizing certain small business operations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3740 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3740 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Assembly | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (78-0-0) |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Substituted for S3740 (1R) |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-03-08 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-11-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4958 (Carry Over) 2022-01-18 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
S3740 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A4958 (1R)
S3740 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A4958 (1R)