NJ A4954 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.492.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.492.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises requirements for provision of counseling and support services to emergency services personnel.
Title
Revises requirements for provision of counseling and support services to emergency services personnel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3368 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Assembly - Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3368 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Assembly - Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.492. |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (71-1-3) |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Substituted for S3368 (1R) |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (69-0-4) |
2019-11-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3368 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - Substituted by A4954 (2R)