NJ A4951 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S542
Note: Carry Over of previous S3279
Note: Carry Over of previous A4925
Note: Carry Over of previous S3279
Note: Carry Over of previous A4925
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits female inmate in correctional facility to request certain medication to prevent pregnancy.
Title
Permits female inmate in correctional facility to request certain medication to prevent pregnancy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4951 (Carry Over) 2020-11-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S3097 (Same As) 2020-11-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S3279 (Carry Over) 2019-12-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4925 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S3097 (Same As) 2020-11-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S3279 (Carry Over) 2019-12-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4925 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A4951 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A5000/4951_I1.HTM |