NJ A4942 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-4)
Status: Passed on November 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-20 - Approved P.L.2020, c.127.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-4)
Status: Passed on November 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-20 - Approved P.L.2020, c.127.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates $87,444,690 from "New Jersey Library Construction Fund" to provide grants for construction, reconstruction, development, extension, improvement, and furnishing of New Jersey's public libraries.
Title
Appropriates $87,444,690 from "New Jersey Library Construction Fund" to provide grants for construction, reconstruction, development, extension, improvement, and furnishing of New Jersey's public libraries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3176 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-20 | Senate | Approved P.L.2020, c.127. |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Substituted for S3176 |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-11-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2020-11-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-11-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3176 (Same As) 2020-11-16 - Substituted by A4942