NJ A4931 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires DOH to establish maternity care evaluation protocols and maternity care evaluation database.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires DOH to establish maternity care evaluation protocols and maternity care evaluation database.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-24AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2019-01-24AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
2019-01-17AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3363 (Same As) 2019-02-07 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback