NJ A4930 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on July 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-07 - Approved P.L.2023, c.100.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on July 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-07 - Approved P.L.2023, c.100.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Expands criminal penalties related to illegal use of motor vehicle master key.
Title
Expands criminal penalties related to illegal use of motor vehicle master key.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3390 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3390 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-07 | Senate | Approved P.L.2023, c.100. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Substituted for S3390 (2R) |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2022-12-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-11-21 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3390 (Same As) 2023-06-20 - Substituted by A4930 (2R)