NJ A4925 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Substituted by S5 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes data reporting requirements for emergency medical services providers and dispatch centers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes data reporting requirements for emergency medical services providers and dispatch centers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-22AssemblySubstituted by S5 (2R)
2017-06-19AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2017-06-12AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2017-06-01AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee

Same As/Similar To

S5 (Same As) 2017-06-22 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-0-0)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback