NJ A4899 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S2855
Note: Carry Foward to future A4478
Note: Carry Foward to future A4478
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-28 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-28 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands existing plug-in electric vehicle incentive program to include incentives for eligible plug-in electric motorcycles.
Title
Expands existing plug-in electric vehicle incentive program to include incentives for eligible plug-in electric motorcycles.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Anthony Verrelli [D] | Sen. Andrew Zwicker [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Rep. Robert Karabinchak [D] | Sen. Britnee Timberlake [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Rep. Roy Freiman [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-3-0) |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-29 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4899 (Carry Over) 2021-06-28 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A4899 (Carry Over) 2021-06-28 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S3019 (Same As) 2020-10-19 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A4899 (Carry Over) 2021-06-28 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S3019 (Same As) 2020-10-19 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee