NJ A4895 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Substituted by S2973
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Substituted by S2973
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates office of deputy superintendent of elections in counties of fifth class.
Title
Creates office of deputy superintendent of elections in counties of fifth class.
Sponsors
Rep. John Armato [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Substituted by S2973 |
2020-12-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-12-14 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-10-26 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2973 (Same As) 2021-04-19 - Approved P.L.2021, c.58.