NJ A4894 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1338
Note: Carry Foward to future A3143
Note: Carry Over of previous S4168
Note: Carry Foward to future A3143
Note: Carry Over of previous S4168
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on October 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Incorporates boardwalks into transportation local aid program and provides for Local Aid Infrastructure Fund grants to boardwalk projects.
Title
Incorporates boardwalks into transportation local aid program and provides for Local Aid Infrastructure Fund grants to boardwalk projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-10-26 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4894 (Carry Over) 2021-05-12 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A4894 (Carry Over) 2021-05-12 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S4168 (Carry Over) 2019-11-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S3397 (Same As) 2021-02-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A4894 (Carry Over) 2021-05-12 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S4168 (Carry Over) 2019-11-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S3397 (Same As) 2021-02-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee