NJ A4884 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Introduced on October 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Substituted by S3070 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Substituted by S3070 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Sexual Violence Restorative Justice Pilot Program."
Title
Establishes "Sexual Violence Restorative Justice Pilot Program."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Substituted by S3070 (1R) |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
2020-10-26 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3070 (Same As) 2021-04-19 - Approved P.L.2021, c.60.