NJ A4859 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-22 - Substituted by S3219 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-22 - Substituted by S3219 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes additional penalties related to child pornography and expands crime to include portrayal of child in sexual manner; establishes crime of leader of child pornography network.
Title
Establishes additional penalties related to child pornography and expands crime to include portrayal of child in sexual manner; establishes crime of leader of child pornography network.
Sponsors
Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Vincent Prieto [D] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] | Rep. Kevin Rooney [R] |
Rep. Elizabeth Maher Muoio [D] | Rep. Marlene Caride [D] | Sen. Parker Space [R] | Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Substituted by S3219 (1R) |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3219 (Same As) 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.141.