NJ A4853 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on January 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-04 - Approved P.L.2020, c.150.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on January 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-04 - Approved P.L.2020, c.150.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reduces or delays increases in employer unemployment taxes related to benefits paid during coronavirus disease 2019 pandemic state of emergency.
Title
Reduces or delays increases in employer unemployment taxes related to benefits paid during coronavirus disease 2019 pandemic state of emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3011 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-26 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-26 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-04 | Senate | Approved P.L.2020, c.150. |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Substituted for S3011 |
2020-11-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2020-10-26 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-22 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-10-19 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3011 (Same As) 2020-11-16 - Substituted by A4853