NJ A4852 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on December 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-04 - Approved P.L.2020, c.131.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on December 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-04 - Approved P.L.2020, c.131.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns eligibility for extended unemployment benefits.
Title
Concerns eligibility for extended unemployment benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3063 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | Senate | Approved P.L.2020, c.131. |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Substituted for S3063 (1R) |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-11-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2020-11-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-10-19 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3063 (Same As) 2020-11-16 - Substituted by A4852 (2R)