NJ A4838 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires telecommunications, cable television, and Internet service providers to allow service recipients to terminate service contracts following physician's referral to long-term care facility.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires telecommunications, cable television, and Internet service providers to allow service recipients to terminate service contracts following physician's referral to long-term care facility.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
2019-06-20AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (75-0-0)
2019-06-10AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2019-05-13AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-05-13AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
2019-01-15AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3390 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback