NJ A4817 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2837
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on December 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Substituted by S368
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Substituted by S368
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes political subdivisions to set aside 0.5 percent of public works funds to recruit and train women and minorities and promote local hiring.
Title
Authorizes political subdivisions to set aside 0.5 percent of public works funds to recruit and train women and minorities and promote local hiring.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Substituted by S368 |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-12-17 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S368 (Same As) 2019-05-02 - Approved P.L.2019, c.76.
S2837 (Carry Over) 2016-12-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S2837 (Carry Over) 2016-12-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee