NJ A4815 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2010
Note: Carry Foward to future S308
Note: Carry Foward to future S308
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes certain guidelines for health insurance carriers concerning step therapy protocols.
Title
Establishes certain guidelines for health insurance carriers concerning step therapy protocols.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (65-1-7) |
2020-10-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-19 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4815 (Carry Over) 2021-04-26 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A4815 (Carry Over) 2021-04-26 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S3051 (Same As) 2020-10-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A4815 (Carry Over) 2021-04-26 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S3051 (Same As) 2020-10-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee