NJ A4805 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on December 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S3323 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S3323 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires VCCO's victim counseling service to partner with trauma centers to refer certain victims to violence intervention programs.
Title
Requires VCCO's victim counseling service to partner with trauma centers to refer certain victims to violence intervention programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S3323 (1R) |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-12-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3323 (Same As) 2019-08-05 - Approved P.L.2019, c.210.