NJ A4804 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Approved P.L.2021, c.162.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Approved P.L.2021, c.162.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Modifies process for obtaining working certificates for minors.
Title
Modifies process for obtaining working certificates for minors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3115 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3115 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.162. |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-0-0) |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Substituted for S3115 (1R) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-11-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
2020-10-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2020-10-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3115 (Same As) 2021-06-03 - Substituted by A4804 (1R)