NJ A4803 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1346
Note: Carry Foward to future S1899
Note: Carry Foward to future S1899
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-22 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-22 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates grant program for business accelerator and incubator networks; transfers $1 million in societal benefits charge revenues to EDA to administer program.
Title
Creates grant program for business accelerator and incubator networks; transfers $1 million in societal benefits charge revenues to EDA to administer program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 22 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (53-22-0) |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4803 (Carry Over) 2017-06-22 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A4803 (Carry Over) 2017-06-22 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S3262 (Same As) 2017-06-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A4803 (Carry Over) 2017-06-22 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S3262 (Same As) 2017-06-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee