NJ A4790 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3120
Note: Carry Foward to future S2287
Note: Carry Foward to future S2287
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Vetoed on February 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-06 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on February 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-06 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes NJ Non-Profit Loan Guarantee Pilot Program within EDA.
Title
Establishes NJ Non-Profit Loan Guarantee Pilot Program within EDA.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3344 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-11-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-20 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3344 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-11-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-20 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-06 | Assembly | Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Substituted for S3344 (1R) |
2022-12-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2022-11-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-2) |
2022-10-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-10-17 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4790 (Carry Over) 2023-02-06 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
A4790 (Carry Over) 2023-02-06 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
S3272 (Same As) 2022-12-01 - Withdrawn from Consideration
S3344 (Same As) 2022-12-19 - Substituted by A4790 (1R)
A4790 (Carry Over) 2023-02-06 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
S3272 (Same As) 2022-12-01 - Withdrawn from Consideration
S3344 (Same As) 2022-12-19 - Substituted by A4790 (1R)