NJ A4790 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S2287
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on October 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-21 - Substituted by S887 (SCS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-21 - Substituted by S887 (SCS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DHS to contract with third party entity to apply risk reduction model to Medicaid prescription drug services.
Title
Requires DHS to contract with third party entity to apply risk reduction model to Medicaid prescription drug services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Substituted by S887 (SCS/1R) |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | Reported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-10-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4790 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Substituted by S887 (SCS/1R)
S887 (Same As) 2021-07-02 - Approved P.L.2021, c.151.
S887 (Same As) 2021-07-02 - Approved P.L.2021, c.151.