NJ A4782 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on December 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-20 - Approved P.L.2018, c.165.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Provides clarification on applicability of "Predatory Towing Prevention Act" to commercial motor vehicles and charging of reasonable fees for certain non-consensual towing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides clarification on applicability of "Predatory Towing Prevention Act" to commercial motor vehicles and charging of reasonable fees for certain non-consensual towing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3225 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-20SenateApproved P.L.2018, c.165.
2018-12-17SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0)
2018-12-17SenateSubstituted for S3225
2018-12-17SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-12-17AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (79-0-0)
2018-12-10AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-12-06AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3225 (Same As) 2018-12-17 - Substituted by A4782

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback