NJ A4781 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes NJ Fuel Cell Task Force to increase use of fuel cells in State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes NJ Fuel Cell Task Force to increase use of fuel cells in State.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
2019-06-20AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
2019-06-10AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2019-05-16AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-12-06AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback