NJ A4774 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future A1265
Note: Carry Foward to future S407
Note: Carry Over of previous S2940
Note: Carry Over of previous A4765

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on October 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies spitting in law enforcement officer's food or drink constitutes aggravated assault; requires certain sanctions on restaurant employees who commit this crime.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarifies spitting in law enforcement officer's food or drink constitutes aggravated assault; requires certain sanctions on restaurant employees who commit this crime.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-10-17AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4774 (Carry Over) 2022-10-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
A4774 (Carry Over) 2022-10-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S1364 (Same As) 2022-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S2940 (Carry Over) 2020-09-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A4765 (Carry Over) 2020-10-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback