NJ A4772 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 11 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Permits counties to impose one-percent hotel tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits counties to impose one-percent hotel tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S3169 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 32 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-01-19SenatePocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
2016-01-11SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (21-16)
2016-01-11SenateSubstituted for S3169
2016-01-11SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2016-01-11AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (41-32-1)
2016-01-07AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-01-07AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2015-11-16AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3169 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by A4772

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback