NJ A4771 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.460.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.460.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands offenses eligible for expungement upon successful discharge from drug court.
Title
Expands offenses eligible for expungement upon successful discharge from drug court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2951 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 62 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2951 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 62 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.460. |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (62-13-0) |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (33-1) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Substituted for S2951 (1R) |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (61-13-0) |
2021-01-25 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2951 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A4771 (1R)