NJ A4766 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1729
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-29 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-29 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits temporary rental assistance for emergency assistance recipients.
Title
Permits temporary rental assistance for emergency assistance recipients.
Sponsors
Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Patricia Jones [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] |
Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4766 (Carry Over) 2017-06-29 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S3260 (Same As) 2017-06-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S3260 (Same As) 2017-06-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee