NJ A4765 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A5584
Note: Carry Foward to future S857
Note: Carry Foward to future S857
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-17 - Substituted by S2663 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-17 - Substituted by S2663 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Subjects domestic equity investments of the Division of Investment to certain requirements, imposes requirements related to selection of external managers and protection of public sector jobs.
Title
Subjects domestic equity investments of the Division of Investment to certain requirements, imposes requirements related to selection of external managers and protection of public sector jobs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-17 | Assembly | Substituted by S2663 (1R) |
2018-12-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-12-06 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4765 (Carry Over) 2018-12-17 - Substituted by S2663 (1R)
A4765 (Carry Over) 2018-12-17 - Substituted by S2663 (1R)
S2663 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
A4765 (Carry Over) 2018-12-17 - Substituted by S2663 (1R)
S2663 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate