NJ A4752 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Passed on December 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-21 - Approved P.L.2023, c.185.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Passed on December 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-21 - Approved P.L.2023, c.185.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Promotes small business Internet presence.
Title
Promotes small business Internet presence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-12-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3210 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-20 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3210 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-20 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-21 | Senate | Approved P.L.2023, c.185. |
2023-12-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-0) |
2023-12-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom. |
2023-12-07 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-1-0) |
2023-12-04 | Assembly | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. |
2023-12-04 | Assembly | First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only |
2023-11-20 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0) |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Substituted for S3210 (1R) |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2022-12-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2022-12-15 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-1-0) |
2022-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-12-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2022-10-20 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee |
2022-10-03 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3210 (Same As) 2023-05-22 - Substituted by A4752 (1R)