NJ A4749 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-12-17 - Substituted by S3186 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends list of environmental infrastructure projects approved for long-term funding for FY2019 to include new projects and remove certain projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends list of environmental infrastructure projects approved for long-term funding for FY2019 to include new projects and remove certain projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-17AssemblySubstituted by S3186 (1R)
2018-12-10AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-12-06AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-12-03AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3186 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Approved P.L.2019, c.12.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback