NJ A4745 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 11 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-01-12 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Raises from 45 to 57 maximum eligibility age for exempt fireman certificates and membership in New Jersey State Fireman's Association.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Raises from 45 to 57 maximum eligibility age for exempt fireman certificates and membership in New Jersey State Fireman's Association.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-07 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-12SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
2021-01-11AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (75-0-0)
2021-01-07AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-12-07AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-09-24AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3277 (Same As) 2020-12-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback