NJ A4740 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Vetoed on January 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-16 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on January 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-16 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides employee access to employee's employment records on file with DOLWD.
Title
Provides employee access to employee's employment records on file with DOLWD.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2970 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-21 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2970 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-21 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-16 | Assembly | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2024-01-08 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-0-0) |
2024-01-08 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Substituted for S2970 (1R) |
2023-12-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2023-01-26 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2023-01-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-10-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2970 (Same As) 2024-01-08 - Substituted by A4740 (1R)