NJ A4735 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Enrolled on December 17 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-12-17 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates $1,591,000 from constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues to State Agriculture Development Committee for grants to certain nonprofit organizations for farmland preservation purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates $1,591,000 from constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues to State Agriculture Development Committee for grants to certain nonprofit organizations for farmland preservation purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3181 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-17SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0)
2018-12-17SenateSubstituted for S3181
2018-12-17SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-12-17AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (79-0-0)
2018-12-10AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-12-06AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-10-29AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3181 (Same As) 2018-12-17 - Substituted by A4735

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback