NJ A4706 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-11-15 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires Division of Travel and Tourism establish Black Heritage Trail; establishes NJ Black Cultural Heritage Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires Division of Travel and Tourism establish Black Heritage Trail; establishes NJ Black Cultural Heritage Commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-11-15 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-15SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2021-06-28SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
2021-06-24AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (73-0-0)
2021-06-21AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2021-06-21AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Budget Committee
2021-03-08AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-09-21AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3727 (Same As) 2021-11-15 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback