NJ A4700 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-01-17 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

"Food Desert Elimination Act"; provides incentives to supermarkets and grocery stores that locate in "food deserts."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Food Desert Elimination Act"; provides incentives to supermarkets and grocery stores that locate in "food deserts."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 25 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-17SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
2018-12-17AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (52-25-1)
2018-12-17AssemblyMotion To Table (Greenwald) (51-26-0)
2018-12-17AssemblyMotion To Aa (Peters)
2018-12-10AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-12-10AssemblyRecommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-12-03AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-10-29AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3233 (Same As) 2018-11-26 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback