NJ A4657 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on October 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S3065 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes youth apprenticeship pilot program in Department of Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes youth apprenticeship pilot program in Department of Education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13AssemblySubstituted by S3065 (2R)
2020-01-06AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-06-10AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-10-22AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3065 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.418.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback