NJ A4656 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on October 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S3064 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S3064 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes task force to develop State-wide plan to diversify apprenticeships.
Title
Establishes task force to develop State-wide plan to diversify apprenticeships.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Substituted by S3064 (1R) |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-22 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3064 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.313.