NJ A4641 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S961
Note: Carry Foward to future A3947
Note: Carry Foward to future A3947
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public officer or employee to forfeit pension upon conviction of certain crimes; alters factors determining honorable service; opens pension to garnishment upon conviction of certain offenses.
Title
Requires public officer or employee to forfeit pension upon conviction of certain crimes; alters factors determining honorable service; opens pension to garnishment upon conviction of certain offenses.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Moriarty [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Sen. Parker Space [R] | Rep. Harold Wirths [R] |
Rep. Roy Freiman [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-10-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 41 N: 31 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-29 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 41 N: 31 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-29 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2022-10-03 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2022-10-03 | Assembly | Motion To Table (41-31-0) (Greenwald) |
2022-10-03 | Assembly | Motion To Aa (Dunn) |
2022-09-29 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-09-22 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4641 (Carry Over) 2022-10-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A4641 (Carry Over) 2022-10-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S3188 (Same As) 2022-10-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A4641 (Carry Over) 2022-10-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S3188 (Same As) 2022-10-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee