NJ A4637 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1691
Note: Carry Foward to future S2544
Note: Carry Foward to future S2840
Note: Carry Foward to future S2544
Note: Carry Foward to future S2840
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns unlawful discrimination and harassment.
Title
Concerns unlawful discrimination and harassment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4637 (Carry Over) 2020-09-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
A4637 (Carry Over) 2020-09-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
A4637 (Carry Over) 2020-09-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S3143 (Same As) 2020-11-09 - Withdrawn from Consideration
S3262 (Same As) 2021-01-11 - Withdrawn from Consideration
S3352 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
A4637 (Carry Over) 2020-09-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
A4637 (Carry Over) 2020-09-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S3143 (Same As) 2020-11-09 - Withdrawn from Consideration
S3262 (Same As) 2021-01-11 - Withdrawn from Consideration
S3352 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A4637 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A5000/4637_I1.HTM |