NJ A4619 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2803
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 8 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 8 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Codifies and extends authorization for certain out-of-State health care practitioners and recent graduates of health care training programs to practice in New Jersey.
Title
Codifies and extends authorization for certain out-of-State health care practitioners and recent graduates of health care training programs to practice in New Jersey.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-04 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-11 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-11 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2024-01-04 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2023-12-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2023-01-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
2022-09-22 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4619 (Carry Over) 2024-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0)
S3596 (Same As) 2023-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S3596 (Same As) 2023-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee