NJ A4612 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Approved P.L.2019, c.117.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Approved P.L.2019, c.117.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Codifies State-specific exam requirement for land surveyor license.
Title
Codifies State-specific exam requirement for land surveyor license.
Sponsors
Rep. Angelica Jimenez [D] | Rep. Pedro Mejia [D] | Rep. Thomas Giblin [D] | Sen. Joseph Cryan [D] |
Rep. Christopher DePhillips [R] | Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] | Sen. Gerald Cardinale [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3057 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3057 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.117. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0) |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Substituted for S3057 (1R) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Amendment (37-0) (Cryan) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-18 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3057 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by A4612 (1R)